EP3127183 - METHOD FOR PASSIVE METAL ACTIVATION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/06] | A METHOD FOR PASSIVE METAL ACTIVATION AND USES THEREOF | ||
[2020/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technion Research & Development Foundation Ltd. Senate House Technion City 3200004 Haifa / IL | [2020/40] |
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Technion Research & Development Foundation Ltd. Senate House Technion City 3200004 Haifa / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIN-ELI, Yair 9 Amnon Vetamar Street 3479157 Haifa / IL | 02 /
GELMAN, Danny Kfar Meshtalmim 134/4 Technion City 3200004 Haifa / IL | 03 /
SHVRATSEV, Boris Kfar Meshtalmim 132/1 Technion City 3200004 Haifa / IL | 04 /
KRAYTSBERG, Alexander 11/1 Bental Street 2068611 Yokneam / IL | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/40] |
Former [2017/06] | Office Kirkpatrick Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | Application number, filing date | 15773010.2 | 31.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015IL50350 | Priority number, date | US201461972481P | 31.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461972481 P | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015151099 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127183 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3127183 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M12/06, C25D3/66, C25D5/34, C25D5/24, H01M6/14, H01M10/054, B23K1/20, B23K35/36, H01M10/0569, H01M12/08, C25D5/54, H01M4/134, H01M4/36, H01M4/46, H01M4/62, // H01M4/02 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
H01M4/044 (EP,US);
B23K35/3605 (EP,US);
B23K35/383 (EP,US);
B23K9/23 (US);
C25D3/665 (EP,US);
C25D5/34 (EP,US);
C25D5/38 (US);
C25D5/54 (EP,US);
C25D5/56 (EP,US);
H01M10/054 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M12/08 (EP,US);
H01M4/134 (EP,US);
H01M4/1395 (EP,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M4/463 (EP,US);
H01M4/628 (EP,US);
H01M4/661 (EP,US);
B23K2103/04 (US);
B23K2103/10 (US);
H01M2004/027 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/06] | H01M12/06, C25D3/66, C25D5/34, C25D5/24, H01M6/14, H01M10/054, B23K1/20, B23K35/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PASSIVEN METALLAKTIVIERUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/06] | English: | METHOD FOR PASSIVE METAL ACTIVATION AND USES THEREOF | [2020/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACTIVATION DE MÉTAL PASSIF ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2017/06] |
Former [2017/06] | A METHOD FOR PASSIVE METAL ACTIVATION AND USES THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 13.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.05.2020 | 08.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2015 | AL | 30.09.2020 | AT | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | NL | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | RS | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | SM | 30.09.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | FR | 31.03.2021 | GB | 31.03.2021 | IE | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | LU | 31.03.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 31.03.2015 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
GB | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
GB | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
GB | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
GB | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
GB | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2010146800 (EQUOS RES CO LTD) [X] 1-8,10,11,13,15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0015] , [0029] * [A] 12 [I] 14; | [X]JP2014032914 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0039] *; | [A] - TSUDA T ET AL, "A highly conductive composite electrolyte consisting of polymer and room temperature molten fluorohydrogenates", SOLID STATE IO, NORTH HOLLAND PUB. COMPANY. AMSTERDAM; NL, NL, (20020802), vol. 149, no. 3-4, doi:10.1016/S0167-2738(02)00399-5, ISSN 0167-2738, pages 295 - 298, XP004370988 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2738(02)00399-5 | International search | [XY]US1922847 (GRENAGLE JAMES B) [X] 39, 41-43, 46-49, 51, 52, 63, 64, 67, 68 * page 1 lines 1-5 ; page 1 lines 69-73 ; page 1 line 104-page 2 line 35 * [Y] 40, 44, 45, 65, 71-73; | [XY]US4619716 (SUZUKI KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 25, 27, 32-36, 38, 47-49, 51, 52, 63, 67, 68, 72 * abstract; col. 1 lines 26-30 ; col. 3 lines 2-38 , 54-60 ; col. 5 lines 17-44 ; col. 13 lines 23-56; col. 15 lines 11-25 * [Y] 26, 28-31, 37, 64, 65, 73; | [XY]US4643241 (YONEKURA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11, 47-49, 51, 52, 67, 68, 72 * abstract; col. 1 lines 34-39 ; col. 2 lines 25-35 ; col. 3 lines 3-6 ; 35-40 ; 51-55 ; Example 1 * [Y] 12, 73; | [XY]EP1983078 (TNO [NL]) [X] 39, 41-44, 46, 51, 55-57, 59, 60, 63, 64, 71 * abstract; para. [0023],[0046],[0074],[0078],[0079],[0085],[0093],[0095] * [Y] 40, 45, 53, 54, 58, 61, 65, 66, 72, 73; | [XY]US2011262816 (AMATUCCI GLENN [US]) [X] 13-19, 47-51, 55, 56, 59 * para. [0013], [0098]-[0105],[0119]-[0127] * [Y] 53, 54, 57, 58, 60-73; | [XY] - CHEN P.-Y. et al., "Electrochemical study of copper in a basic 1-ethyl-3-ethylimidazolium tetrafluoroborate room temperature molten salt", Electrochimica Acta, (19990000), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 441 - 450, XP055229196 [X] 39, 41, 46, 51, 55, 56, 60, 61 * abstract; section 3.5 - pages 448-449 * [Y] 40, 42-45, 57-59, 63-66, 71-73 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0013-4686(99)00275-3 | [PX] - GELMAN D. et al., "Aluminum-air battery based on an ionic liquid Electrolyte", J. Mater. Chem. A, (20140000), pages 20237 - 20242, XP055229200 [PX] 1-10, 13-20, 23, 24, 47-51, 56, 60-62 * The whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4TA04721D | by applicant | US5082812 | US5411583 | US5587142 | DE19731349 | JP2010146800 | JP2014032914 | - KURT R. et al., J. Am. Ceram. Soc., (19990000), vol. 82, no. 12, pages 3561 - 66 | - NOCKEMANN P. et al., J. Phys. Chem. B, (20060000), vol. 110, pages 20978 - 20992 | - TSUDA, T. et al., Solid State Ionics, (20020000), vol. 149, pages 295 - 298 | - SHVARTSEV, B. et al., Phys. Chem. Chem. Phys., (20130000), vol. 15, no. 41, pages 17837 - 45 | - DOCHE, M.L. et al., Corros. Sci., (19990000), vol. 41, page 805 | - EGAN, D.R. et al., Journal of Power Sources, (20130000), vol. 236 | - HAGIWARA, R. et al., Journal of the Electrochemical Society, (20020000), vol. 149, no. 1, pages D1 - D6 |