Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3126195

EP3126195 - AUTOMATIC DISPLAY MIRROR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CZ
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gentex Corporation
600 North Centennial Street
Zeeland, MI 49464 / US
[2017/06]
Inventor(s)01 / VANDERPLOEG, John A.
600 North Centennial Street
Zeeland, Michigan 49464 / US
02 / VANVUUREN, Mark A.
600 North Centennial Street
Zeeland, Michigan 49464 / US
03 / LEE, Ethan J.
600 North Centennial Street
Zeeland, Michigan 49464 / US
 [2017/06]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2017/06]
Application number, filing date15774077.001.04.2015
[2017/06]
WO2015US23846
Priority number, dateUS201461973447P01.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461973447 P
[2017/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015153740
Date:08.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3126195
Date:08.02.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015
[2017/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3126195
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU08.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/04, B60R1/12, B60R1/08
[2017/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE ANZEIGESPIEGELANORDNUNG[2017/06]
English:AUTOMATIC DISPLAY MIRROR ASSEMBLY[2017/06]
French:ENSEMBLE MIROIR D'AFFICHAGE AUTOMATIQUE[2017/06]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2016National basic fee paid 
22.09.2016Search fee paid 
22.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/06]
20.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.03.2019Fee for grant paid
28.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
18.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/07]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[IY]WO2007029137  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; NIEUWKERK ARMANDA C [NL]; VAN DEL) [I] 1,2,4,5 * page 1, line 3 - page 5, line 16; figure - * [Y] 3,6-12;
 [Y]US2004160657  (TONAR WILLIAM L [US] ET AL) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0294]; figure - *;
 [Y]EP0067335  (GENTEX CORP [US]) [Y] 6-12 * page 1, line 4 - page 23, line 29; figure - *
International search[A]US2013279014  (GENTEX CORPORATION) [A] 1-3, 7-9, 13-15 * , paragraphs [0016]-[0021], fig. 1-6 *;
 [A]US8282226  (DONNELLY CORPORATION) [A] 1-3, 7-9, 13-15 * , col. 10, line 24-col. 11, line 39, col. 18, line 28-col. 19, line 57, fig. 1-7 *;
 [A]US7683326  (GENTEX CORPORATION) [A] 1-3, 7-9, 13-15 * , col. 10, line 28-col. 12, line 58, fig. 1-7 *