Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3128312

EP3128312 - JOINING STATE DETERMINATION METHOD AND SHAPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/06]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKANO, Ryohei
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2017/06]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/06]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15774094.519.02.2015
[2017/06]
WO2015JP00789
Priority number, dateJP2014007598402.04.2014         Original published format: JP 2014075984
[2017/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015151392
Date:08.10.2015
Language:JA
[2015/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3128312
Date:08.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3128312
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/88, B29D30/30, G01B11/24, G01M17/02, G01N21/952, G06T7/00, G06T7/50, B29D30/00
[2017/16]
Former International [2017/06]G01N21/88, B29D30/30, G01B11/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSZUSTANDSBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UND FORMUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2017/06]
English:JOINING STATE DETERMINATION METHOD AND SHAPING DEVICE[2017/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'ÉTAT D'ASSEMBLAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN FORME[2017/06]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2016Translation filed 
22.09.2016National basic fee paid 
22.09.2016Search fee paid 
22.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/06]
22.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2018Fee for grant paid
17.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)06.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
LU19.02.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/45]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/37]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
NO05.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT05.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2010020398  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [I] 1-6 * page 1, lines 6-9 * * page 4, lines 23-26 * * page 10, lines 3-7 * * page 6, lines 20-23 * * page 12, lines 3-6 * * page 13, lines 17-24 * * page 19, lines 21-25,30,31 * * page 21, lines 7-10 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [I]DE102012016587  (HARBURG FREUNDENBERGER MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] , [0032] , [0034] , [0039]; figures 2-8 *;
 [I]DE3926721  (KRUPP MASCHINENTECHNIK [DE]) [I] 1-6 * column 2, lines 45-61 * * column 3, lines 35-62 * * column 4, lines 30-34 * * column 4, lines 43-58 * * figures 1,2,4a-4d *;
 [A]WO2013012082  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [P]EP2735433  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0015] , [0017] , [0038] , [0040] , [0042] , [0058] *
International search[A]JP2011007633  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007530962  (Texmag GmbH Vertriebsgesellschaft) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2009/0116003 A1 & EP 1733182 A & WO 2005/093368 A1 & CN 1985147 A *;
 [A]JP2012220254  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *
ExaminationJPH095246