Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3205060

EP3205060 - OPEN-LOOP TIMING AND CYCLIC PREFIXES IN CELLULAR INTERNET OF THINGS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/33]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Junyi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / LANE, Frank, Anton
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/33]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/33]
Application number, filing date15775319.521.09.2015
[2017/33]
WO2015US51178
Priority number, dateUS20141451091009.10.2014         Original published format: US201414510910
[2017/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016057195
Date:14.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3205060
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016
[2017/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/26
[2017/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/33]
TitleGerman:OFFENE REGELKREISTAKTUNG UND ZYKLISCHE PRÄFIXE IN EINER INTERNET-DER-DINGE-MOBILFUNKKOMMUNIKATION[2017/33]
English:OPEN-LOOP TIMING AND CYCLIC PREFIXES IN CELLULAR INTERNET OF THINGS COMMUNICATION[2017/33]
French:SYNCHRONISATION EN BOUCLE OUVERTE ET PRÉFIXES CYCLIQUES DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS CELLULAIRES DE L'INTERNET DES OBJETS[2017/33]
Entry into regional phase01.03.2017National basic fee paid 
01.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
01.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/33]
01.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2012281551  (ALANAERAE SEPPO MATIAS [FI]) [X] 1,12,23,27 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0052]; figures 4,5,6,8 * [I] 2-11,13-22,24-26,28-30;
 [I]WO2014112907  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-30 * figures 3-9 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] *;
 [A]US2013003897  (KIM JUN WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0035]; figures 6-10; claim 1 *