Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3200702

EP3200702 - TIBIAL TUBERCLE OSTEOTOMY GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Sports Medicine, LLC
56 E. Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
[2017/32]
Inventor(s)01 / MAXSON, William
165 Cape Hatteras Dr.
Ponte Vedra, Florida 32081 / US
 [2017/43]
Former [2017/32]01 / MAXSON, William
6730 Snowberry Drive
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46814 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/32]
Application number, filing date15775589.328.09.2015
[2017/32]
WO2015US52591
Priority number, dateUS20141450001929.09.2014         Original published format: US201414500019
[2017/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016053843
Date:07.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3200702
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/17, A61B17/15, A61F2/28
[2017/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
TitleGerman:OSTEOTOMIEFÜHRUNG FÜR TIBIATUBERKEL[2017/32]
English:TIBIAL TUBERCLE OSTEOTOMY GUIDE[2017/32]
French:OSTÉOTOMIE DU TUBERCULE DU TIBIA[2017/32]
Entry into regional phase26.04.2017National basic fee paid 
26.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
26.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/32]
26.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2009318924  (HELENBOLT KENNETH T [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6,9,11,12,14,16,17 * paragraphs [0017] - [0030]; figure - *;
 [X]US2004158255  (JUSTIN DANIEL F [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,9-14,16 * paragraphs [0022] - [0036]; figures 4-8 *;
 [X]WO2013179142  (KYON AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,9,12,14-17 * paragraphs [0025] , [0039] - [0041]; figure - *;
 [XI]US2012184962  (MERCHANT ALAN C [US]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0076] , [0097] - [0105] - [0121] , [0122] , [0124] , [0129]; figures 3-14,28-38,46-58 * [I] 11;
 [XI]US2008154267  (MERCHANT ALAN C [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,9,12-14,16 * paragraphs [0026] - [0033] - [0046] - [0052]; figures 4-11,27-35 * [I] 3,4;
 [A]US2013030540  (LEIBINGER RITA [DE]) [A] 15 * paragraph [0031]; figure - *;
 [A]US2012197410  (HORAN TIMOTHY J [US] ET AL) [A] 15 * paragraphs [0046] , [0053] , [0056]; figures 6A-8B *
by applicantUS8632547
 US8241293