Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3129885

EP3129885 - SOFTWARE TEST AUTOMATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Turnkey Solutions Corp.
Suite 1020
143 Union Blvd.
Lakewood, Colorado 80228 / US
[2017/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ELLIS, Dale
15851 West 56th Place
Golden, Colorado 80403 / US
02 / JACQUES, Ryan
916 North Park Avenue
Helena, Montana 59601 / US
 [2017/07]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2017/07]
Application number, filing date15776875.508.04.2015
[2017/07]
WO2015US25008
Priority number, dateUS201461976967P08.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461976967 P
[2017/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015157470
Date:15.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3129885
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015
[2017/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/26, G06F11/263, G06F11/36
[2018/09]
Former International [2017/07]G06F11/26, G06F11/263
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/07]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR SOFTWARETEST-AUTOMATISIERUNG[2017/07]
English:SOFTWARE TEST AUTOMATION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2017/07]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AUTOMATISATION DE TEST DE LOGICIEL[2017/07]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2016National basic fee paid 
07.11.2016Search fee paid 
07.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/07]
07.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5974254  (HSU RAY [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * claims 1-15 *
International search[X]US2002166081  (RICHARDSON, S et al.) [X] 1-15, 17-31, 32/1-32/15, 32/17-32/31 * ; Figures 2, 4A, 4B; Paragraph [0060], [0063]-[0066], [0071], [0076], [0150], [0158]-[0164] *;
 [X]US5335342  (POPE, G et al.) [X] 16, 32/16 * ; Abstract; Figures 1, 2; Column 3, Lines 45-61; Column 4, Lines 11-15; Column 6, Lines 25-30; Column 7, Lines 27-42 *;
 [A]US2006184918  (ROSARIA, S et al.) [A] 1-32 * ; entire document *;
 [A]WO2010004557  (QUALI SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-32 * ; entire document *