Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3130083

EP3130083 - MULTISTAGE COMBINING SUB-SYSTEM FOR DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CommScope Technologies LLC
1100 CommScope Place SE
Hickory, NC 28602 / US
[2017/07]
Inventor(s)01 / LANGE, Keld Knut
Schillerstrasse 11
75443 Oetisheim / DE
 [2017/07]
Representative(s)Abel & Imray
Westpoint Building
James Street West
Bath BA1 2DA / GB
[2019/50]
Former [2017/07]Burt, Matthew Thomas , et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date15777133.805.03.2015
[2017/07]
WO2015US18922
Priority number, dateUS201461977273P09.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461977273 P
[2017/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015156927
Date:15.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3130083
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015
[2017/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3130083
Date:11.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/022, H04B7/08, H04B7/155, H04W88/08, // H04B1/10
[2019/29]
Former International [2017/52]H04W88/08, H04B7/022, H04B7/08, // H04B1/10
Former International [2017/07]H04B7/005, H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRSTUFENKOMBINIERENDES UNTERSYSTEM FÜR VERTEILTES ANTENNENSYSTEM[2017/07]
English:MULTISTAGE COMBINING SUB-SYSTEM FOR DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM[2017/07]
French:SOUS-SYSTÈME DE COMBINAISON À PLUSIEURS ÉTAGES POUR SYSTÈME D'ANTENNES DISTRIBUÉES[2017/07]
Entry into regional phase11.10.2016National basic fee paid 
11.10.2016Search fee paid 
11.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/07]
11.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2019Fee for grant paid
04.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19214219.8
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2013329825  (OREN YAIR [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9,11,12,15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 13] , [0 14] , [0 20] , [0 32] , [0 42] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0058] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 2,10 [I] 5-8,13,14
International search[YA]US2013329825  (OREN YAIR [US], et al) [Y] 1, 9, 16 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0059]; and figs. 1-4. * [A] 2-8, 10-15, 17-22;
 [Y]US2012257659  (BRAZ OLIVER [DE], et al) [Y] 1, 9, 16 * See paragraphs [0043]-[0073]; and figs. 1, 2. *;
 [A]US2004203394  (SOLUM JEFFREY [US]) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0026]; and figs. 1-3. *;
 [A]US2013071112  (MELESTER MATTHEW THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0079]; and figs. 2-6. *;
 [A]US2011274145  (BRAZ OLIVER [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0059]; and figs. 1, 2. *