Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3201521

EP3201521 - LIGHTING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE WITH AN OPTICAL ELEMENT CLAMPED TOGETHER WITH THE LIGHT SOURCE SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Vision Belgique
Parc Industriel, 31
7822 Meslin l'Evêque / BE
[2017/32]
Inventor(s)01 / DINANT, Franck
Rue Emile Vandervelde N° 27
B-1460 Virginal / BE
02 / DEBERT, Florestan
16 G Rue Haute
F-59310 Nomain / FR
03 / DELOURME, Jean-François
6 rue de la belle promenade
F-59150 Wattrelos / FR
 [2017/32]
Representative(s)Schaffner, Jean
Valeo Vision
34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny / FR
[2017/32]
Application number, filing date15777640.224.09.2015
[2017/32]
WO2015EP72017
Priority number, dateFR2014005927430.09.2014         Original published format: FR 1459274
[2017/32]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016050610
Date:07.04.2016
Language:FR
[2016/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3201521
Date:09.08.2017
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:F21S8/10, B60Q1/20
[2017/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG MIT EINEM AM LICHTQUELLENTRÄGER GEKLEMMTEN OPTISCHEN ELEMENT[2017/32]
English:LIGHTING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE WITH AN OPTICAL ELEMENT CLAMPED TOGETHER WITH THE LIGHT SOURCE SUPPORT[2017/32]
French:DISPOSITIF LUMINEUX DE VEHICULE AVEC UN ELEMENT OPTIQUE PLAQUE AVEC LE SUPPORT DE SOURCE LUMINEUSE[2017/32]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2017National basic fee paid 
28.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/32]
28.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP1547862  (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,11-17 * abstract * [Y] 3 [I] 17;
 [X]US4797790  (BROEDLING GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]FR2907196  (VALEO VISION SA [FR]) [Y] 3 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2993632  (VALEO VISION BELGIQUE [BE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2623370  (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2887960  (VALEO VISION SA [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004042070  (YAGI SEIICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *
by applicantEP1762776
 EP1970619