Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3229999

EP3229999 - DRILLING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / IBARRA, Javier
81732 Shadow Avenue
Indio, California 92201 / US
02 / MCAULIFFE, Pat
6450 N. Leoti Avenue
Chicago, IL 60646 / US
 [2017/42]
Application number, filing date15777967.912.10.2015
[2017/42]
WO2015EP73513
Priority number, dateDE20141022532009.12.2014         Original published format: DE102014225320
[2017/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016091431
Date:16.06.2016
Language:DE
[2016/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3229999
Date:18.10.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B23B51/02, B21H3/10, B23P15/32, B21K5/02
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
TitleGerman:BOHRWERKZEUG[2017/42]
English:DRILLING TOOL[2017/42]
French:OUTIL DE PERÇAGE[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2017National basic fee paid 
10.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
26.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US1499797  (WOODS NORMAN E) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11 * page 2, line 121 - page 3, line 3; figure all * * page 1, paragraph 2 * [A] 12 [I] 3,7-9;
 [XAI]EP2801421  (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10,11 * page 1, paragraph 1; figure all * [A] 12 [I] 4,7-9;
 [XA]US1607089  (LEIDECKER FOSTER H) [X] 12 * page 1, paragraph 1; figure all * [A] 1-11;
 [XA]US2223107  (ALFRED HURSCHMAN) [X] 12 * page 1, paragraph 1; figure all * [A] 1-11
by applicantEP0792705