Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3200712

EP3200712 - SYSTEMS FOR EVALUATING NEUROMODULATION THERAPY VIA HEMODYNAMIC RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/32]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EVALUATING NEUROMODULATION THERAPY VIA HEMODYNAMIC RESPONSES
[2020/07]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Change - classificationpublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
10.01.2020Change - classificationpublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
10.01.2020Change - German titlepublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
10.01.2020Change - English titlepublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
10.01.2020Change - French titlepublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic Ardian Luxembourg S.à.r.l.
102 rue des Maraîchers
2124 Luxembourg / LU
[2017/32]
Inventor(s)01 / HETTRICK, Douglas
c/o IP Legal Department
Medtronic Vascular Inc.
3576 Unocal Place
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
02 / SCHEINER, Avram
c/o IP Legal Department
Medtronic Vascular Inc.
3576 Unocal Place
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
 [2017/32]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
[2017/32]
Application number, filing date15778571.801.10.2015
[2017/32]
WO2015US53499
Priority number, dateUS201462058420P01.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462058420 P
US201462058434P01.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462058434 P
[2017/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016054379
Date:07.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3200712
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/12, A61B18/14, // A61N1/05, A61B18/00
[2020/07]
Former International [2017/32]A61B18/12, A61B18/14, A61B18/00, A61N1/05
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME ZUR BEURTEILUNG EINER NEUROMODULATIONSTHERAPIE ÜBER HÄMODYNAMISCHE REAKTIONEN[2020/07]
English:SYSTEMS FOR EVALUATING NEUROMODULATION THERAPY VIA HEMODYNAMIC RESPONSES[2020/07]
French:SYSTÈMES D'ÉVALUATION D'UNE THÉRAPIE DE NEUROMODULATION VIA DES RÉPONSES HÉMODYNAMIQUES[2020/07]
Former [2017/32]SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG EINER NEUROMODULATIONSTHERAPIE ÜBER HÄMODYNAMISCHE REAKTIONEN
Former [2017/32]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EVALUATING NEUROMODULATION THERAPY VIA HEMODYNAMIC RESPONSES
Former [2017/32]SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ÉVALUATION D'UNE THÉRAPIE DE NEUROMODULATION VIA DES RÉPONSES HÉMODYNAMIQUES
Entry into regional phase04.04.2017National basic fee paid 
04.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/32]
04.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.01.2020
13.01.2020Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2014149550  (ST JUDE MEDICAL CARDIOLOGY DIV [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0013] , [0043] - [0063] - [0071]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 9-12;
 [Y]US2010222851  (DEEM MARK [US], et al) [Y] 9-12 * paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]US2014249520  (GHAFFARI ROOZBEH [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0093] - [0104] *;
 [A]US2012232409  (STAHMANN JEFFREY E [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] *