Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3216308

EP3216308 - LOW POWER DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION WITH A SECOND RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
15.11.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/37]
Inventor(s)01 / ANG, Peter Pui Lok
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / JI, Tingfang
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / BURKE, Joseph Patrick
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / SORIAGA, Joseph Binamira
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / SHELLHAMMER, Stephen Jay
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / MUKKAVILLI, Krishna Kiran
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
07 / SMEE, John Edward
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/37]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/37]
Application number, filing date15778574.201.10.2015
[2017/37]
WO2015US53547
Priority number, dateUS201462075088P04.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462075088 P
US201462077058P07.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462077058 P
US20151481552031.07.2015         Original published format: US201514815520
[2017/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016073087
Date:12.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3216308
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016
[2017/37]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3216308
Date:18.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02, H04W76/28, // H04W88/06, H04W76/16
[2019/27]
Former International [2017/37]H04W76/04, H04W52/02, H04W88/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:DISKONTINUIERLICHER NIEDRIGLEISTUNGSEMPFANG MIT EINEM ZWEITEN EMPFÄNGER[2017/37]
English:LOW POWER DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION WITH A SECOND RECEIVER[2017/37]
French:RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE DE FAIBLE PUISSANCE AVEC UN SECOND RÉCEPTEUR[2017/37]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2017National basic fee paid 
28.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/37]
28.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2019Fee for grant paid
06.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19208662.7
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2014220926  (SHIKAMA HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10,12,18,20,23,25 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] * [I] 2,5-9,11,13-17,19,21,22,24,26;
 [XI]US2013039239  (LIN YUNG-SEN [TW]) [X] 1,10,18,23 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0040] * * claims 1, 2 * [I] 2-9,11-17,19-22,24-26;
 [I]US2013064151  (MUJTABA SYED A [US], et al) [I] 1-26 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0063] *