Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3202192

EP3202192 - TECHNIQUES FOR MANAGING POWER ON AN UPLINK COMPONENT CARRIER TRANSMITTED OVER A SHARED RADIO FREQUENCY SPECTRUM BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/32]For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Wanshi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / DAMNJANOVIC, Aleksandar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/32]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/32]
Application number, filing date15779076.721.09.2015
[2017/32]
WO2015US51162
Priority number, dateUS201462058823P02.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462058823 P
US20151485868818.09.2015         Original published format: US201514858688
[2017/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016053660
Date:07.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3202192
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/32, H04W52/36, H04W52/34, H04W52/14, H04W52/28, H04W52/44
[2017/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STROMVERWALTUNG AUF EINEM ÜBER EIN GEMEINSAMES FUNKFREQUENZBAND GESENDETEN UPLINK-KOMPONENTENTRÄGER[2017/32]
English:TECHNIQUES FOR MANAGING POWER ON AN UPLINK COMPONENT CARRIER TRANSMITTED OVER A SHARED RADIO FREQUENCY SPECTRUM BAND[2017/32]
French:TECHNIQUES DE GESTION DE PUISSANCE SUR UNE COMPOSANTE PORTEUSE DE LIAISON MONTANTE ÉMISE SUR UNE BANDE PARTAGÉE DU SPECTRE DE FRÉQUENCES RADIO[2017/32]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2017National basic fee paid 
16.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/32]
16.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]US2013203458  (CHARBIT GILLES [GB], et al) [X] 1,20-22,24,25,30 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0070] * [A] 7-10,13,14,18,19,29 [Y] 2-6,12,15,26-28 [I] 11,16,17,23;
 [Y]WO2013025562  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [Y] 2-6,26-28 * paragraphs [0200] , [0209] - [0212] *;
 [Y]WO2014069085  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 12,15 * abstract *;
 [P]EP2916598  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0014] *;
 [A]WO2014117335  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 16-19 * abstract *;
 [A]US2014071862  (JI HYOUNGJU [KR], et al) [A] 16-19 * abstract *
 [Y]  - NTT DOCOMO, "Details of guaranteed power PMeNB and PSeNB", vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20140818 - 20140822, (20140810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-143221, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_78/Docs/, (20140810), XP050815613 [Y] 3-5,27 * sections 1 and 4 *
 [Y]  - SHARP, "UL power allocation for dual connectivity", vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20140818 - 20140822, (20140810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-143124, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_78/Docs/, (20140810), XP050815517 [Y] 3-6,27,28 * sections 1 and 2.2 *