Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3132633

EP3132633 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING APERIODIC CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2017/08]
Inventor(s)01 / YI, Yunjung
LG Electronics Inc.
Seocho R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
02 / KIM, Kijun
LG Electronics Inc.
Seocho R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
03 / PARK, Jonghyun
LG Electronics Inc.
Seocho R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
04 / YANG, Suckchel
LG Electronics Inc.
Seocho R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
 [2017/08]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/08]
Application number, filing date15779893.516.04.2015
[2017/08]
WO2015KR03827
Priority number, dateUS201461980531P16.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461980531 P
US201462086673P02.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462086673 P
[2017/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015160198
Date:22.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3132633
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2015
[2017/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3132633
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/024, H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04W76/15, // H04L5/00
[2018/42]
Former International [2017/48]H04B7/024, H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04W76/02
Former International [2017/08]H04W24/10, H04W76/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG APERIODISCHER KANALSTATUSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2017/08]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING APERIODIC CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2017/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL APÉRIODIQUES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2017/08]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2016National basic fee paid 
25.10.2016Search fee paid 
25.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/08]
25.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2019Fee for grant paid
04.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.03.2019
AT20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
MC20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
PL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
SM20.03.2019
LU16.04.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
IS20.07.2019
PT20.07.2019
[2020/07]
Former [2020/04]AL20.03.2019
AT20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
PL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
SM20.03.2019
LU16.04.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
IS20.07.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2020/03]AL20.03.2019
AT20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
PL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
SM20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2019/52]AL20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
PL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
SM20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2019/51]AL20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
SM20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2019/49]AL20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[Y]CA2873611  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0065] *;
 [Y]  - NTT DOCOMO, "Views on remaining issues on dual connectivity", vol. RAN WG1, no. Shenzhen, China; 20140331 - 20140404, (20140330), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-141470, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20140330), XP050787139 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - FUJITSU, "Discussion on aperiodic CSI feedback for CoMP transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20120813 - 20120817, (20120805), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-123348 APERIODIC CSI FEEDBACK READY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_70/Docs/, (20120805), XP050661232 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [AP]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Remaining RAN1 issues on dual connectivity", vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20140818 - 20140822, (20140817), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-143174 DC DETAILS_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20140817), XP050788651 [AP] 1-13 * the whole document *
International search[Y]WO2014051333  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [86]-[89], [107]-[109], [156], [157]; and claims 1, 2. *;
 [Y]US2014086174  (NAM YOUNG-HAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0056]-[0058], [0149]; and claim 1. *;
 [A]WO2013112024  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [36]-[39], [45]; and claim 1. *;
 [A]WO2013148347  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0006], [0007], [0068], [0091], [0092]; and claim 1. *
 [A]  - ERICSSON et al., "Way Forward on Limiting UE Complexity for CoMP CSI Processing", R1-123931, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #70, Qingdao, China, (20120817), URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_70/Docs, XP050661810 [A] 1-15 * See slide 6. *
Examination   - CATT, "UE category related L1 processing capability for dual connectivity", vol. RAN WG1, no. Shenzhen, China; 20140331 - 20140404, (20140330), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-141364, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20140330), XP050787036
    - SAMSUNG, "L1 UE capability handling for dual connectivity", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140215, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-140701 L1 CAPABILITY HANDLING FOR DC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140209), XP050792000