Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3132948

EP3132948 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/08]
Inventor(s)01 / ONUKI Atsushi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2017/08]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/08]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15780184.618.03.2015
[2017/08]
WO2015JP57980
Priority number, dateJP2014008669918.04.2014         Original published format: JP 2014086699
[2017/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015159633
Date:22.10.2015
Language:JA
[2015/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3132948
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3132948
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60C9/18, B60C9/00, B60C9/20, D07B1/06
[2017/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:REIFEN[2017/08]
English:TIRE[2017/08]
French:PNEU[2017/08]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2016Translation filed 
16.11.2016National basic fee paid 
16.11.2016Search fee paid 
16.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/08]
16.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2018Fee for grant paid
23.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)06.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
LU18.03.2019
[2020/01]
Former [2019/46]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/37]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
NO05.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT05.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2010089725  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]US2004026001  (KOHNO YOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0016] , [0017] , [0021] , [0030] - [0034] *;
 [A]EP0655352  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *
International search[XY]JP2010089725  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0013], [0015] to [0023], [0028]; table 1; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 1-4;
 [XY]JPH07242102  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0005] to [0006], [0013] to [0014], [0043] to [0048]; tables 4 to 5; fig. 1 to 4 & US 5520233 A & EP 0655352 A1 * [Y] 2-4;
 [Y]JP2008120349  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0006] to [0007], [0011] to [0018], [0022] to [0025]; table 1; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2001328407  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 3-4 * , paragraphs [0013] to [0019], [0024]; fig. 1 to 2, 6 to 7 (Family: none) *