Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3207551

EP3207551 - TANK FOR ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.07.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
28.06.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[2017/34]
Inventor(s)01 / BRODEUR, Samuel
1960 McIntosh
Saint-Bruno-de-Montarville, Québec J3V 6N1 / CA
 [2017/34]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2017/34]Fiorentino, Luca
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date15781343.714.10.2015
[2017/34]
WO2015EP73815
Priority number, dateUS20141451515015.10.2014         Original published format: US201414515150
[2017/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016059128
Date:21.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3207551
Date:23.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2016
[2017/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/02
[2017/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/34]
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTER FÜR ELEKTRISCHE AUSRÜSTUNG[2017/34]
English:TANK FOR ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT[2017/34]
French:RÉSERVOIR POUR ÉQUIPEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE[2017/34]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2017National basic fee paid 
12.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/34]
12.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201703   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US4024978  (KIUCHI TADASHI, et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,10-13,16 * column 1, lines 6 - 48, 45 * * column 3, lines 47 - 62 * * column 6, lines 40 - 53 * * figures 6, 7 * [A] 8,9,15,17 [I] 2,4,5,14,18-20;
 [XAI]US2013187739  (SULLIVAN ELIZABETH D [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,12,13,16 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0027] , [ 0028] , [ 0030] , [ 0031] , [ 0034] * [A] 8,9,15,17 [I] 2,4-6,10,11,18-20;
 [XI]US4492314  (AVERY RANDALL N [US]) [X] 1,3,6,11,12,14 * column 1, lines 7 - 11 * * column 2, lines 10 - 19, 31 - 42, 51 - 54 and 60 - 63 * * claims 6, 10 * * figures 1 - 4 * [I] 4,5,10,13;
 [XI]GB2050069  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 12-14 * page 1, lines 6 - 13, 22 - 29, 48 - 61 and 90 - 103 * * page 2, line 124 - page 3, line 12 * * figures 1-16 * [I] 1,3,4;
 [XI]US3270305  (ANDREW GLASSANOS) [X] 12,14 * column 1, lines 9 - 24 * * column 2, lines 41 - 45 and 54 - 60 * * column 3, lines 40 - 43 and 53 - 63 * * column 4, lines 5 - 10 * * pages 1, 2 * [I] 1,4,11;
 [A]US1722149  (JOHANNES KUBLER) [A] 1,4,12,14 * page 1, lines 3 - 10 and 30 - 38 * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]EP0074521  (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,10,12-14 * page 1, lines 7 - 10 and 20 - 28 * * page 2, lines 1 - 22 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 3 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS59150409  (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1,3,4,10,12-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US4453197  (BURRAGE LAWRENCE M [US]) [A] 12-16 * column 1, lines 5 - 14 * * column 7, lines 3 - 11 * * column 8, lines 25 - 37 * * column 11, lines 2 - 32 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]US6050329  (DURIAN STEWART WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1,20 * column 1, lines 8 - 20 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 19 * * figure 1 *