Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3234345

EP3234345 - DECOUPLING ELEMENT FOR A FUEL INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2018First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHEFFEL, Martin
Sudetenstr 70
71665 Vaihingen / DE
02 / REINHARDT, Wilhelm
Schoenenberger Str. 81
75443 Oetisheim / DE
 [2017/43]
Application number, filing date15781373.419.10.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015EP74144
Priority number, dateDE20141022598816.12.2014         Original published format: DE102014225988
[2017/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016096200
Date:23.06.2016
Language:DE
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3234345
Date:25.10.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:F02M61/14, F02M61/16
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:ENTKOPPLUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINE BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG[2017/43]
English:DECOUPLING ELEMENT FOR A FUEL INJECTION DEVICE[2017/43]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE DÉSACCOUPLEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2017National basic fee paid 
17.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
06.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO9900595  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12 * page 11, line 19 - line 38; figure 4 * * abstract * [I] 6-10;
 [X]GB803523  (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 1,4,11,12 * page 1 - page 3; figure 1 * * abstract *;
 [X]WO2014079609  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,11,12 * page 10, line 31 - page 11, line 4; figure 7 * * abstract *
by applicantDE10108466
 DE10027662
 DE10038763
 EP1223337
 US6009856