Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3134523

EP3134523 - SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE STRAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017Supplementary search reportpublished on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
04.08.2017Change - classificationpublished on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
04.08.2017Change - classificationpublished on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scandinavian Technology Group AB
Ole Römers väg 12
223 70 Lund / SE
[2017/09]
Inventor(s)01 / BONANDER, Nicklas
Västra Eklanda Höjd 93
S-431 59 Mölndal / SE
 [2017/09]
Representative(s)Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2017/09]
Application number, filing date15782335.223.04.2015
[2017/09]
WO2015SE50456
Priority number, dateSE2014005048423.04.2014         Original published format: SE 1450484
SE2014005085104.07.2014         Original published format: SE 1450851
[2017/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015163814
Date:29.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3134523
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015
[2017/09]
Search report(s)International search reportSE29.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/04, C12P7/06, C12N1/18, C12R1/865
[2017/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/09]
TitleGerman:SACCHAROMYCES-CEREVISIAE-STÄMME[2017/09]
English:SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE STRAINS[2017/09]
French:SOUCHES DE SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE[2017/09]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase20.10.2016National basic fee paid 
20.10.2016Search fee paid 
20.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/09]
20.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012067571  (SCANDINAVIAN TECHNOLOGY GROUP AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 4 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [XP]  - TOMOHISA HASUNUMA ET AL, "Development of a GIN11/FRT-based multiple-gene integration technique affording inhibitor-tolerant, hemicellulolytic, xylose-utilizing abilities to industrial Saccharomyces cerevisiae strains for ethanol production from undetoxified lignocellulosic hemicelluloses", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, BIOMED CENTRAL, GB, (20141012), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1186/S12934-014-0145-9, ISSN 1475-2859, page 145, XP021201520 [XP] 1-8,10-13 * abstract * * pages 147-149 * * pages 153-155 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12934-014-0145-9
International search[X]WO2005121337  (MICROBIOGEN PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-17 * ; abstract; page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 14; page 5, lines 5-31; page 7, lines 4-15; page 9, lines 11-30; page 11, lines 1-19; page 15, lines 3-14; page 21, lines 5-10; page 22, lines 24-33; page 25, lines 12-25; page 26, lines 1-22; page 38, line 21 - page 39, line 17; page 41, lines 13-32; page *;
 [X]WO2009155633  (MICROBIOGEN PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-17 * ; whole document *;
 [A]WO2006115455  (FORSKARPATENT I SYD AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-17 * ; whole document *