Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3133967

EP3133967 - TWO-SIDED GRILL AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.04.2018  [2018/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Restaurant Technology, Inc.
2915 Jorie Boulevard
Oak Brook, IL 60523 / US
[2017/09]
Inventor(s)01 / DORSTEN, Ron
1253 N. Schmidt Road
Romeoville, IL 60446 / US
02 / EWALD, Henry, T.
1253 N. Schmidt Road
Romeoville, IL 60446 / US
03 / CALZADA, Manual
One Kroc Drive
Oak Brook, IL 60523 / US
 [2017/09]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2017/09]
Application number, filing date15782546.422.04.2015
[2017/09]
WO2015US27063
Priority number, dateUS20141426202625.04.2014         Original published format: US201414262026
[2017/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015164489
Date:29.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3133967
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015
[2017/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A47J37/06
[2017/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/09]
TitleGerman:ZWEISEITIGER GRILL UND VERFAHREN[2017/09]
English:TWO-SIDED GRILL AND METHOD[2017/09]
French:GRIL À DEUX CÔTÉS ET PROCÉDÉ[2017/09]
Entry into regional phase25.11.2016National basic fee paid 
25.11.2016Search fee paid 
25.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/09]
25.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.03.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[YA]US6016743  (GLAVAN RONALD J [US]) [Y] 11 * column 3, lines 12-21 * * column 4, line 8 - column 9, line 49; figure - * [A] 1-9;
 [YA]US2007077338  (CALZADA MANUEL [US], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0006] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0071]; figure - * [A] 1-9;
 [A]US5341727  (DICKSON J DOUGLAS [US]) [A] 1-9,11 * column 4, line 4 - column 15, line 38; figure - *
International search[XY]US8359970  (CALZADA MANUEL [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4-6, 8, 9, 20, 24, 27 * entire document * [Y] 3, 10;
 [X]US2005247210  (RAGAN GARY [US]) [X] 19, 28-30 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2014026764  (SYKES MICHAEL [CA], et al) [Y] 3, 10 * entire document *;
 [A]US5802958  (HERMANSSON ALF E [CA]) [A] 1-30 * entire document *;
 [A]US2014023755  (CLAESSON JAN [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * entire document *