Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3137130 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3137130



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 506
09.09.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.08.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.07.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
28.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.06.2019 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
24.05.2019 Brief communication with time limit (Legal Division) Search / examination 1
15.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
15.05.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 119
12.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 119
22.01.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.06.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
25.06.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.06.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
25.06.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
25.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.01.2018 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
11.12.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.12.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
11.12.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
04.12.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
19.05.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.05.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.04.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.04.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.02.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.01.2017 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
12.01.2017 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.01.2017 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
12.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.11.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
09.09.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.01.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.01.2016 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.11.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
05.11.2015 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 127