Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3207305

EP3207305 - THREE-CHANNEL TUNED LED LAMP FOR PRODUCING BIOLOGICALLY-ADJUSTED LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biological Illumination, LLC
1830 Penn Street
Melbourne, Florida 32901 / US
[2017/34]
Inventor(s)01 / MAXIK, Fredric
52 Country Club Road
Cocoa Beach, Florida 32931 / US
02 / BARTINE, David
93 Delannoy Avenue 306
Cocoa, Florida 32922 / US
03 / SOLER, Robert
833 S. Brevard Avenue
Cocoa Beach, Florida 32937 / US
04 / GROVE, Eliza
913 S. Patrick Drive
Satellite Beach, Florida 32937 / US
05 / BRETSCHNEIDER, Eric
2375 Titan Way
Apt. 2123
Bowling Green, Kentucky 42104 / US
 [2017/34]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2017/34]Fiorentino, Luca
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date15790329.512.10.2015
[2017/34]
WO2015US55103
Priority number, dateUS20141451401014.10.2014         Original published format: US201414514010
[2017/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016060982
Date:21.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3207305
Date:23.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2016
[2017/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:F21K99/00, H05B33/08
[2017/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/34]
TitleGerman:DREIKANALIGE ABGESTIMMTE LED-LAMPE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIOLOGISCH EINGESTELLTEM LICHT[2017/34]
English:THREE-CHANNEL TUNED LED LAMP FOR PRODUCING BIOLOGICALLY-ADJUSTED LIGHT[2017/34]
French:LAMPE À DEL ACCORDÉE À TROIS CANAUX DESTINÉE À PRODUIRE UNE LUMIÈRE RÉGLÉE BIOLOGIQUEMENT[2017/34]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2017National basic fee paid 
13.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/34]
13.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[I]US2013140988  (MAXIK FREDRIC S [US] ET AL) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1-18; claims 1-67 *;
 [I]US2014049192  (MAXIK FREDRIC S [US] ET AL) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0113]; figures 2-3 *;
 [I]US2013278137  (MAXIK FREDRIC S [US] ET AL) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0053] *;
 [I]US2014228914  (VAN DE VEN ANTONY PAUL [HK] ET AL) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0156] *;
 [I]US2011299277  (EHARA TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0065] *;
 [A]US2014185281  (LEE CHUN-HSING [TW] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7319293