Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3212689

EP3212689 - HYDROPHILIC PREPOLYMER FOR POLYURETHANE FOAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2017/36]
Inventor(s)01 / SRIVASTAVA, Yasmin N.
7023 Gossamer Lane
Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US
02 / GAMBOA, Rogelio
20022 County Road 461
Brazoria, TX 77422 / US
03 / DUGGAL, Rajat
11306 Silver Bay Court
Pearland, TX 77584 / US
 [2017/36]
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/36]Raynor, John
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date15790418.626.10.2015
[2017/36]
WO2015US57295
Priority number, dateUS201462072198P29.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462072198 P
[2017/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016069437
Date:06.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3212689
Date:06.09.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016
[2017/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3212689
Date:28.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/76, C08G18/48, C08G101/00, C08G18/12, A47G9/10, C08J9/00, A47C27/14
[2018/26]
Former International [2017/36]C08G18/76, C08G18/48, C08G101/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:HYDROPHILES PREPOLYMER FÜR POLYURETHANSCHÄUME[2018/26]
English:HYDROPHILIC PREPOLYMER FOR POLYURETHANE FOAMS[2017/36]
French:PRÉPOLYMÈRE HYDROPHILE POUR MOUSSES POLYURÉTHANE[2018/26]
Former [2017/36]HYDROPHILES VORPOLYMER FÜR POLYURETHANSCHÄUME
Former [2017/36]PRÉPOLYMÈRE HYDROPHILE POUR MOUSSES DE POLYURÉTHANE
Entry into regional phase26.05.2017National basic fee paid 
26.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/36]
26.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2018Fee for grant paid
01.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SI28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/40]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT28.11.2018
NO28.02.2019
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2004074343  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * page 2, line 14 - page 6, line 23 * * page 7, line 24 - page 9, line 16 * * examples 5,6 *;
 [A]US2006058408  (SAM FELIX O [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0006] - [0046] , [0050] * * examples 2,5 *;
 [A]US5231116  (SANO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 16 * * example 3 *
by applicantWO2004074343