Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3227375

EP3227375 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING RESISTANCE TO YELLOWING IN POLYAMIDE ARTICLES AND POLYAMIDE ARTICLES OBTAINED FROM THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rhodia Poliamida E Especialidades Ltda
Av. Maria Coelho Aguiar 215
Bloco B - 1° andar
Parte 1 - Jardim Sao Luiz
Sao Paulo - SP / BR
[2017/41]
Inventor(s)01 / BONALDI, Renata, Redondo
478 Abernesia Street
Santo Andre
09070-100 São Paulo - SP / BR
02 / GORESCU, Gabriel
Rua Gama Lobo 1565
Apto. 81
Ipiranga
04269-001 São Paulo - SP / BR
03 / CANOVA, Thomas, Gonzaga
Rua Ermelinda Maneira 39
Indaiatuba
13340-632 São Paulo - SP / BR
04 / DOS SANTOS, Everton, Ferreira
355 Crystal Avenida
Parque California
Jacarei
12311-210 São Paulo - SP / BR
 [2017/41]
Representative(s)Ridray, Annabelle
Rhodia Operations
Direction Propriété Industrielle
85, avenue des frères Perret
69192 Saint Fons / FR
[2017/41]
Application number, filing date15791354.201.10.2015
[2017/41]
WO2015IB01764
Priority number, dateWO2014IB0265303.12.2014         Original published format: PCT/IB2014/002653
[2017/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016087913
Date:09.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3227375
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/42, C08G69/02, C08G69/16, C08G69/48
[2017/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON BESTÄNDIGKEIT GEGEN VERGILBUNG IN POLYAMIDARTIKELN UND AUS DIESEM VERFAHREN ERHALTENE POLYAMIDARTIKEL[2017/41]
English:METHOD FOR PROVIDING RESISTANCE TO YELLOWING IN POLYAMIDE ARTICLES AND POLYAMIDE ARTICLES OBTAINED FROM THIS METHOD[2017/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE CONFÉRER UNE RÉSISTANCE AU JAUNISSEMENT À DES ARTICLES EN POLYAMIDE ET ARTICLES EN POLYAMIDE OBTENUS SUIVANT CE PROCÉDÉ[2017/41]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2017National basic fee paid 
03.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/41]
12.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XDA]US2011196093  (ORTIZ CESAR G [US], et al) [XD] 1-9,16-19 * paragraph [0035] * * example - * * claim 1 * [A] 15;
 [XDA]US3846507  (THOMM E, et al) [XD] 1-14,16-19 * example 2 * [A] 15;
 [A]US2009249555  (DEWHURST ROBERT [GB], et al) [A] 1-19 * example - * * claim - *
by applicantUS2009249555
 WO2011076085
 US2011196093
 US3846507
    - DORFLER, C., "Yellowing on polyamide: Reasons and prevention", MELLIAND INTERNATIONAL., (200809), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 248 - 250
    - "Amarelamento com antioxidants", QUIMICA TEXTII., (200509), pages 28 - 35
    - LITHERLAND, A; YOUNG, TC, "Phenolic yellowing of textiles during storage. Part 1 - Occurrence, characterization and causes", JSDC, (198307), vol. 99, pages 201 - 207, XP009047807