Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3216273

EP3216273 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS AND METHODS HAVING A USER EQUIPMENT-CENTRIC MEDIUM ACCESS CONTROL LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/37]
Inventor(s)01 / JI, Tingfang
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / HORN, Gavin, Bernard
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / SMEE, John, Edward
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / SORIAGA, Joseph, Binamira
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / BHUSHAN, Naga
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / JIANG, Jing
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
07 / AZARIAN YAZDI, Kambiz
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
08 / ANG, Peter, Pui Lok
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
09 / GAAL, Peter
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
10 / MUKKAVILLI, Krishna, Kiran
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
11 / GOROKHOV, Alexei, Yurievitch
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/37]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/37]
Application number, filing date15791852.527.10.2015
[2017/37]
WO2015US57579
Priority number, dateUS201462074488P03.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462074488 P
US201462083071P21.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462083071 P
US20151472875602.06.2015         Original published format: US201514728756
[2017/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016073243
Date:12.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3216273
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016
[2017/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/14, H04W56/00, H04W72/04, H04W76/04
[2017/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/37]
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN MIT EINER BENUTZERGERÄTEZENTRISCHEN MEDIENZUGANGSSTEUERUNGSSCHICHT[2017/37]
English:WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS AND METHODS HAVING A USER EQUIPMENT-CENTRIC MEDIUM ACCESS CONTROL LAYER[2017/37]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL AYANT UNE COUCHE DE COMMANDE D'ACCÈS AU SUPPORT CENTRÉE SUR UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR[2017/37]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2017National basic fee paid 
29.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/37]
29.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)EP17208651.4  / EP3328129
EP17208654.8  / EP3328130
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5392331  (PATSIOKAS STELIOS J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,19,20,22,38,39,41,50,52,56,58,61,63,66,68,71,73 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 30 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 4 * * column 5, lines 1-21 * * column 6, line 29 - column 9, line 6 * [I] 2,4-18,21,23-37,40,42-49,51,53-55,57,59,60,62,64,65,67,69,70,72,74,75;
 [XI]US2012329456  (MAKH VANSH PAL SINGH [US], et al) [X] 1,20,39,50,56,61,66,71 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] - [0015] - [0033] - [0038] - [0041] - [0050] - [0053] - [0064] - [0072] - [0075] - [0081] , [0085] - [0089] * [I] 2-19,21-38,40-49,51-55,57-60,62-65,67-70,72-75;
 [A]EP1655982  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-75 * paragraphs [0007] - [0023] *