Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3142857

EP3142857 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING A VENEERED ELEMENT AND SUCH A VENEERED ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Välinge Innovation AB
Prästavägen 513
263 65 Viken / SE
[2017/12]
Inventor(s)01 / ZIEGLER, Göran
Hästhovsvägen 11
SE-263 62 Viken / SE
02 / MEIJER, Thomas
Vångavägen 1
SE-263 63 Viken / SE
03 / NYGREN, Per
Surbrunnsgatan 15
SE-253 60 Ramlösa / SE
04 / LUNDBLAD, Christer
Talliden 10a
286 31 Örkelljunga / SE
 [2019/02]
Former [2017/12]01 / ZIEGLER, Göran
Hästhovsvägen 11
SE-263 62 Viken / SE
02 / MEIJER, Thomas
Vångavägen 1
SE-263 63 Viken / SE
03 / NYGREN, Per
Surbrunnsgatan 15
SE-253 60 Ramlösa / SE
04 / LUNDBLAD, Christer
Mattarp Pl. 1502
SE-286 92 Örkelljunga / SE
Application number, filing date15791987.911.05.2015
[2017/12]
WO2015SE50524
Priority number, dateSE2014005055212.05.2014         Original published format: SE 1450552
SE2014005115429.09.2014         Original published format: SE 1451154
WO2015SE5000809.01.2015         Original published format: PCT/SE2015/050008
US20151459345809.01.2015         Original published format: US201514593458
[2017/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015174909
Date:19.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3142857
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015
[2017/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE19.11.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:B32B21/14, B27D1/06, B44C5/04, B32B21/02
[2017/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/12]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FURNIERTEN ELEMENTS UND SOLCH EIN FURNIERTES ELEMENT[2017/12]
English:A METHOD OF PRODUCING A VENEERED ELEMENT AND SUCH A VENEERED ELEMENT[2017/12]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT PLAQUÉ ET ÉLÉMENT PLAQUÉ CORRESPONDANT[2017/12]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2016National basic fee paid 
27.10.2016Search fee paid 
27.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/12]
27.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2119550  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7-9,11-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 1,2, 8-10 * [I] 2,4-6,10;
 [X]WO2009065769  (VAELINGE INNOVATION BELGIUM BV [BE], et al) [X] 1,3,9,12,14,15 * abstract * * page 10, line 22 - line 26 *
International search[Y]WO2009065769  (VAELINGE INNOVATION BELGIUM BV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-32 * ; page 13, line 15 - page 14, line 11; page 34, line 15 - line 28; figures 1 Oa-c *;
 [Y]US2720478  (HOGG JAMES H) [Y] 1-32 * ; column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 15; column 7, line 1 -line 16; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US2831794  (ELMENDORF ARMIN) [Y] 1-3 * ; column 4, line 14 - line 53; column 5, line 19 - line 29; figure 1; claims 1-11 *;
 [Y]US5059472  (LE BELL JEAN [FI], et al) [Y] 1-32 * ; abstract; column 1, line 8 - line 63; column 3, line 31 - line 61 ; column 4, line 3 - line 11; column 5, line 28 -line 54; column 8, line 24 - line 59; column 9, line 23 - line 31; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US3729368  (INGHAM R, et al) [A] 1-32 * ; column 1, line 13 - line 42; column 2, line 57 - line 59; column 4, line 20 - line 26 *;
 [A]EP2263867  (HUELSTA WERKE HUELS KG [DE]) [A] 1-32 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0016], [0035]; figure 4; claims 1, 3, 6 *;
 [A]DE3634885  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-32 * ; abstract; claim 8 *;
 [A]US2831793  (ELMENDORF ARMIN) [A] 1-32 * ; whole document; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2634534  (OWEN BROWN) [A] 1-32 * ; figures 1-3,6; claims 1-7 *;
 [A]US2630395  (VERNON MCCULLOUGH KENNETH, et al) [A] 1-32 * figures 1-2; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]WO2009050565  (FLOORING IND LTD SARL [LU], et al) [A] 1-32 * ; abstract; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3308013  (BRYANT BENJAMIN S) [A] 1-32 * ; column 2, line 11 - line 24; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2013025216  (REICHWEIN DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * ; abstract; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2419614  (WELCH ARTHUR R) [A] 1-32 * ; column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 71 ; figures 1-4 *