blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3216326 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3216326



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 153
30.10.2015 Request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4
30.10.2015 Drawings PCT receiving Office 5
30.10.2015 Description PCT receiving Office 14
30.10.2015 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
30.10.2015 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
12.11.2015 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
13.11.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 1
13.11.2015 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
13.11.2015 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
13.11.2015 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 4
13.11.2015 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 1
14.01.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
14.01.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
14.01.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
12.05.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25
12.05.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.05.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
31.05.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
17.03.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
29.03.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
29.03.2017 Priority search results Search / examination 9
29.03.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.04.2017 Statement under Art. 19 PCT Search / examination 3
04.04.2017 Statement under Art. 19 PCT Search / examination 3
04.04.2017 Claims filed under Art.19 PCT Search / examination 2
04.04.2017 Claims filed under Art.19 PCT Search / examination 2
04.04.2017 Claims filed under Art.19 PCT Search / examination 2
23.05.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
09.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.06.2017 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
17.08.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
28.05.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
06.09.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1