blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3216326


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.05.2019 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
06.12.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
05.01.2018 Change: Validation states published on  07.02.2018  [2018/06]
05.01.2018 Change - extension states published on  07.02.2018  [2018/06]
30.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.08.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
11.08.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
11.08.2017 Request for examination filed published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
18.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2017 Change - representative
05.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
17.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
13.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
21.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication