blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3216326
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3216326Global Dossier 13.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
DE102014016248 04.11.2014
WO2015EP02175 30.10.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016070978Global Dossier 12.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
DE102014016248 04.11.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102014016248 04.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
DE102014016248 04.11.2014