Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3216326

EP3216326 - CIRCUIT BOARD COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE QUADRUPOLE CURRENT MEASURING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Häusermann GmbH
Zitternberg 100
3571 Gars am Kamp / AT
[2017/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HACKL, Johann
Villengasse 158
A-3571 Gars/Thunau / AT
02 / HÖRTH, Stefan
Oberer Markt 3
A-3631 Ottenschlag / AT
03 / REDL, Norbert
Rosenweg 1
A-3741 Pulkau / AT
 [2017/37]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2017/37]
Application number, filing date15793704.630.10.2015
[2017/37]
WO2015EP02175
Priority number, dateDE2014101624804.11.2014         Original published format: DE102014016248
[2017/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016070978
Date:12.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3216326
Date:13.09.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016
[2017/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/02, H05K1/16, H05K3/10
[2017/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/37]
TitleGerman:LEITERPLATTE MIT MINDESTENS EINEM VIERPOLSTROM-MESSELEMENT[2017/37]
English:CIRCUIT BOARD COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE QUADRUPOLE CURRENT MEASURING ELEMENT[2017/37]
French:CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ POURVUE D'UN OU DE PLUSIEURS ÉLÉMENTS DE MESURE DE COURANT DE QUADRIPÔLE[2017/37]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2017National basic fee paid 
29.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/37]
29.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE102008022787  (LEAR CORP [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * [I] 2,3,7-9;
 [XI]US2004207989  (FAUH JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * figures 2A, 2B * [I] 3,4,7-9;
 [XI]DE102005019922  (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * abstract * [I] 3,4,7-9;
 [A]US2002050827  (KRONROD JAMES M [US] ET AL) [A] 8 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] *;
 [XPI]WO2015071367  (JUMATECH GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1,2,5,6,9 * pages 6-7,8; figures 1,2 * [I] 4,7,8;
 [XPI]WO2015091218  (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]) [XP] 1-3,5,6,9 * abstract * * page 6 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1 * [I] 4,7,8