Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3180754

EP3180754 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR ADVERTISING OVER A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cloudbanter Ltd.
83 Baker Street
London W1U 6AG / GB
[2017/25]
Inventor(s)01 / BABCOCK, Clay
5245 Wayzata Blvd 507
St. Louis Park, Minnesota 55416 / US
02 / WILLIAMS, Graham
34 Grange Park
London W5 3PP / GB
 [2017/32]
Former [2017/25]01 / BABCOCK, Clay
1678 Humboldt Avenue
West St. Paul, Minnesota 55118 / US
02 / WILLIAMS, Graham
34 Grange Park
London W5 3PP / GB
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/25]
Application number, filing date15794608.807.10.2015
[2017/25]
WO2015GB52936
Priority number, dateGB2014001853119.10.2014         Original published format: GB 201418531
GB2015000903427.05.2015         Original published format: GB 201509034
GB2015001691624.09.2015         Original published format: GB 201516916
[2017/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016063005
Date:28.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3180754
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016
[2017/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3180754
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/02, G06Q50/00, H04W4/14
[2017/42]
Former International [2017/25]G06Q30/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT FÜR WERBUNGEN ÜBER EIN NETZWERK[2017/25]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR ADVERTISING OVER A NETWORK[2017/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR FAIRE DE LA PUBLICITÉ SUR UN RÉSEAU[2017/25]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2017National basic fee paid 
16.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/25]
16.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.02.2018Fee for grant paid
01.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.03.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
12.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
IE07.10.2018
LU07.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
CH31.10.2018
LI31.10.2018
[2019/48]
Former [2019/40]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
LU07.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
CH31.10.2018
LI31.10.2018
Former [2019/38]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
LU07.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
Former [2019/30]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
LU07.10.2018
Former [2019/28]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/26]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/11]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/09]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Cited inInternational search[I]US2009203359  (MAKHOUL ELIE [CA] ET AL) [I] 1-82 * abstract * * figures 6-10 * * paragraphs [0038] - [0054] *;
 [I]WO2012131430  (RATHOD YOGESH CHUNILAL [IN]) [I] 1-82 * abstract * * claims 1-47 * * page 38 *;
 [I]US2009186635  (VIERI RICCARDO [IT]) [I] 1-82 * the whole document *;
 [I]EP2523410  (IND TECH RES INST [TW]) [I] 1-82 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2008130565  (ROAMWARE INC [US]; JIANG JOHN [US]; HAN ZONGWEI [CN]) [I] 1-82 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2013226701