Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3215981

EP3215981 - NONPARAMETRIC MODEL FOR DETECTION OF SPATIALLY DIVERSE TEMPORAL PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/37]
Inventor(s)01 / SHAMAIE, Atid
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/37]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/37]
Application number, filing date15795312.606.11.2015
[2017/37]
WO2015US59475
Priority number, dateUS201462076319P06.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462076319 P
US20151493397605.11.2015         Original published format: US201514933976
[2017/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016073856
Date:12.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3215981
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016
[2017/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/62, G06K9/00
[2017/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/37]
TitleGerman:NICHTPARAMETRISCHES MODELL ZUR ERKENNUNG VON RÄUMLICH VERSCHIEDENEN ZEITLICHEN MUSTERN[2017/37]
English:NONPARAMETRIC MODEL FOR DETECTION OF SPATIALLY DIVERSE TEMPORAL PATTERNS[2017/37]
French:MODÈLE NON PARAMÉTRIQUE DE DÉTECTION DE MOTIFS TEMPORELS À DIVERSITÉ SPATIALE[2017/37]
Entry into regional phase11.04.2017National basic fee paid 
11.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/37]
11.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US2011041100  (BOILLOT MARC [US]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005]; figures 9,10,18 *;
 [XI]  - ELMEZAIN M ET AL, "Improving Hand Gesture Recognition Using 3D Combined Features", MACHINE VISION, 2009. ICMV '09. SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091228), ISBN 978-0-7695-3944-7, pages 128 - 132, XP031610618 [X] 1,2,5,11-13,16,22-24 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,6-10,14-21
 [A]  - JING ZHEN ET AL, "Spatio-temporal unified model for on-line handwritten Chinese character recognition", DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION, 1999. ICDAR '99. PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BANGALORE, INDIA 20-22 SEPT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19990920), ISBN 978-0-7695-0318-9, pages 649 - 652, XP010351328 [A] 1-24 * abstract *
 [A]  - YEE WHYE TEH, "A hierarchical Bayesian language model based on Pitman-Yor processes", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 21ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTATIONAL LINGUISTICS AND THE 44TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ACL , ACL '06, Morristown, NJ, USA, (20060716), doi:10.3115/1220175.1220299, pages 985 - 992, XP055238660 [A] 1-24 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3115/1220175.1220299