Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3145350

EP3145350 - HANDHELD VAPORIZING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.02.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuryan Holdings Limited
610 Poinsettia Avenue
San Mateo, CA 94403 / US
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / LEUNG, David, Chung Sing
610 Poinsettia Avenue
San Mateo, CA 94403 / US
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2017/13]Coyle, Philip Aidan
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
Application number, filing date15795447.021.05.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015US31978
Priority number, dateUS201462001972P22.05.2014         Original published format: US 201462001972 P
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015179641
Date:26.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3145350
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.11.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A24F47/00, A61M15/06, F22B1/28, H05B1/02, H05B3/02, H05B3/46, A61M16/00, A61M11/04
[2018/04]
Former International [2017/13]A24F47/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
TitleGerman:TRAGBARER VERDAMPFER[2017/13]
English:HANDHELD VAPORIZING DEVICE[2017/13]
French:DISPOSITIF DE VAPORISATION PORTATIF[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2016National basic fee paid 
01.12.2016Search fee paid 
01.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
01.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5894841  (VOGES ROBERT MARTIN [AU]) [Y] 1-15 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 60 * * column 7, lines 47-53 * * column 12, lines 2-8 * * figures 2,5 *;
 [Y]US2013220314  (BOTTOM DOUGLAS [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0022] , [0027] , [0044] , [0059] - [0061] * * figure 6 *;
 [A]WO2014066730  (LBS IMP S LLC [US]) [A] 1,4-15 * page 43, line 4 - page 44, line 19 *;
 [A]US2011097060  (MICHAEL BUZZETTI MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1,4-15 * paragraph [0034] *;
 [A]DE202013105420U  (NICOTINE TECHNOLOGY INC E [US]) [A] 2,3 * paragraph [0125] *;
 [A]US4557888  (RAUSING ANDERS R [CH], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 1, lines 49-68 * * column 9, lines 11-26 * * column 9, line 25 *
International search[Y]US8511318  (HON LIK [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * entire document *;
 [Y]US8365742  (HON LIK [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2011315152  (HEARN ALEX [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * entire document *;
 [A]US8528569  (NEWTON KYLE D [US]) [A] 1-15 * entire document *;
 [A]US8393331  (HON LIK [CN]) [A] 1-15 * entire document *