Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3145350 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3145350



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 104
18.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.06.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.06.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
18.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.06.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.02.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
21.02.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.12.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.07.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.07.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.07.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
19.07.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
19.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.01.2018 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 5
03.01.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
31.07.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.01.2017 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
18.01.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.12.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
01.12.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.11.2016 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.09.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
14.12.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
26.11.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
26.11.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 14