Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3145350 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201580027300 EP15795447



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10334878Global Dossier 02.07.2019B2
US2015335074 26.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201514718551 21.05.2015
US201462001972 22.05.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20170008245Global Dossier 23.01.2017A
Priority number Date
US201462001972 22.05.2014
WO2015US31978 21.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6605590BGlobal Dossier 13.11.2019B2
JP2017520274 27.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US201462001972 22.05.2014
WO2015US31978 21.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106413447Global Dossier 15.02.2017A
Priority number Date
US201462001972 22.05.2014
WO2015US31978 21.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3145350Global Dossier 24.01.2018A4
EP3145350 29.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201462001972 22.05.2014
WO2015US31978 21.05.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015179641Global Dossier 26.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201462001972 22.05.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2019193654Global Dossier 07.11.2019A
Priority number Date
US201462001972 22.05.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI666994B 01.08.2019B
TW201609006 16.03.2016A
Priority number Date
US201462001972 22.05.2014