Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3146344

EP3146344 - TREATMENT OF CANCER AND INHIBITION OF METASTASIS USING HEMOGLOBIN BETA SUBUNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.08.2017  [2017/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Maryland, Baltimore
620 West Lexington Street, 4th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21201 / US
For all designated states
Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd.
P.O. Box 39296
6139201 Tel-Aviv / IL
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / LU, Wuyuan
9914 Frederick Road
Ellicott City, Maryland 21042 / US
02 / WITZ, Isaac
18 Aharon Box Street
74067 Ness Ziona / IL
03 / MAMAN, Shelly
1 Eli Cohen Street
69630 Tel Aviv / IL
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Geling, Andrea
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/13]Geling, Andrea
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
Application number, filing date15795747.321.05.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015US31996
Priority number, dateUS201462001911P22.05.2014         Original published format: US 201462001911 P
US201462095413P22.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462095413 P
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015179657
Date:26.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3146344
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68, G01N33/53, G01N30/22, G01N30/72, A61K38/42, A61P35/00
[2017/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS UND HEMMUNG VON METASTASEN MITTELS HÄMOGLOBIN-BETA-UNTEREINHEIT[2017/13]
English:TREATMENT OF CANCER AND INHIBITION OF METASTASIS USING HEMOGLOBIN BETA SUBUNIT[2017/13]
French:TRAITEMENT DU CANCER ET INHIBITION DE MÉTASTASES À L'AIDE DE SOUS-UNITÉ BÊTA DE L'HÉMOGLOBINE[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2016National basic fee paid 
01.12.2016Search fee paid 
01.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
01.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.06.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2013074820  (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US]) [X] 20-41 * See abstract; pages 12-13; claims 1-47. *;
 [A]  - CAPULLI et al., "Increased expression of a set of genes enriched in oxygen binding function discloses a predisposition of breast cancer bone metastases to generate metastasis spread in multiple organs", Journal of Bone and Mineral Research, (20120000), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 2387 - 2398, XP 055238345 [A] 20-41 * See the whole document. *
 [A]  - STRECKFUS et al., "Salivary protein profiles among HER2/neu-receptor-positive and -negative breast cancer patients: Support for using salivary protein profiles for modeling breast cancer progression", Journal of Oncology, (20120000), vol. 2012, pages 1 - 9, XP 055238346 [A] 20-41 * See the whole document. *
 [A]  - LIU et al., "Effect of chronic intermittent hypoxia on biological behavior and hypoxia-associated gene expression in lung cancer cells", Journal of Cellular Biochemistry, (20100000), vol. 111, no. 3, pages 554 - 563, XP 055238348 [A] 20-41 * See the whole document. *
 [PX]  - MAMAN et al., "A new lung-derived factor inhibits neuroblastoma lung metastasis by inducing cancer cell dormancy", 15th International Biennial Congress of the Metastasis Research Society, Heidelberg, Germany, (20140630), page 181, XP008185366 [PX] 20-41 * See the whole document. *