Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3145390

EP3145390 - BG METER ILLUMINATED TEST STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roche Diabetes Care, Inc.
9115 Hague Road
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
For all designated states
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / CARTER, Robert E.
405 West Main Street
Pittsboro, IN 46167 / US
02 / SAUERS, Matthew C.
5068 Clemens Place
Indianapolis, IN 46239 / US
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/13]Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date15796223.419.05.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015US31573
Priority number, dateUS20141428236420.05.2014         Original published format: US201414282364
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015179395
Date:26.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3145390
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.11.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61B5/157, G01N27/327, G01N33/49, G01N33/487
[2017/48]
Former International [2017/13]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTETER TESTSTREIFEN FÜR BG-MESSGERÄT[2017/13]
English:BG METER ILLUMINATED TEST STRIP[2017/13]
French:BANDELETTE RÉACTIVE ÉCLAIRÉE DE MESURE DE LA GLYCÉMIE[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2016National basic fee paid 
16.11.2016Search fee paid 
16.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
16.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US8431408  (LEWIS JOSEPH B. ET AL) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004219691  (SHARTLE ROBERT J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2012003306  (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS OPERATIONS [US]; RIGGLES RANDALL K [US]; DIEBOLD ERI) [I] 1-19 * pages 12-13; figure - *;
 [A]US2010021342  (JOSEPH ABNER DAVID [US] ET AL) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0008] *;
 [A]EP1424040  (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]; HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0040]; figure 8 *;
 [A]KR100816799B  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM, ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS ET AL) [A] 1-19 * figure - *
International search[XY]US8431408  (Lewis et al.) [X] 1, 4, 5, 7 and 8 * Entire document, especially Fig 1-4, and 7; it 30 and col 2, In 36-38; col 4, In 24-60; col 5, In 3-30 and col 7, In 33-36 * [Y] 2 3, 6 and 9-15;
 [Y]US2004219691  (Shartle et al.) [Y] 2 3, 6 and 9-15 * Entire document, especially para [0008], [0009] and [0060] *