Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3146727

EP3146727 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING THE REMOTE CONTROL FUNCTIONALITY OF A PORTABLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universal Electronics, Inc.
201 E. Sandpointe Avenue, 8th Floor
Santa Ana, CA 92707 / US
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / ARLING, Paul D.
32 Prairie Grass
Irvine, California 92660 / US
02 / HAYES, Patrick H.
22981 Arija
Mission Viejo, California 92691 / US
03 / HATAMBEIKI, Arsham
2429 WaterMarke Place
Irvine, California 92612 / US
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/13]Cordina, Kevin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date15796548.412.05.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015US30258
Priority number, dateUS20141428278520.05.2014         Original published format: US201414282785
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015179165
Date:26.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3146727
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.11.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/2668
[2017/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURIERUNG DER FERNSTEUERUNGSFUNKTIONALITÄT EINER TRAGBAREN VORRICHTUNG[2017/13]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING THE REMOTE CONTROL FUNCTIONALITY OF A PORTABLE DEVICE[2017/13]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION DE LA FONCTIONNALITÉ DE COMMANDE À DISTANCE D'UN DISPOSITIF PORTABLE[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase21.10.2016National basic fee paid 
21.10.2016Search fee paid 
21.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
21.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2013085851  (PEDRO JEFF [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0059]; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US2012284758  (ADJESSON ERIC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2010043046  (SEN SHONDIP [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0238]; figures 1-10 *;
 [X]US2010228611  (SHENFIELD MICHAEL [CA]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0094]; figures 1-7 *
International search[X]US2012144416  (WETZER MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * entire document. *;
 [A]US2012200400  (ARLING PAUL D [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * entire document. *;
 [A]US2013124309  (TRAASDAHL ARE HELGE [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * entire document. *;
 [A]US2010228611  (SHENFIELD MICHAEL [CA]) [A] 1-16 * entire document. *;
 [A]US2008231762  (HARDACKER ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * entire document. *