Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3146906

EP3146906 - EXCLUDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toray Fine Chemicals Co., Ltd.
3-1, Kanda-Sudacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0041 / JP
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / KATAOKA, Shintaro
c/o Matsuyama Plant
Toray Fine Chemicals Co. Ltd.
360 Okaga 3-chome
Matsuyama Ehime 791-8057 / JP
02 / HIRABARA, Takehiko
c/o Toray Fine Chemicals Co. Ltd.
8-1 Kakuda-cho
Kita-ku
Osaka 530-0017 / JP
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/13]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date15796741.515.05.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015JP64042
Priority number, dateJP2014010370119.05.2014         Original published format: JP 2014103701
[2017/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015178311
Date:26.11.2015
Language:JA
[2015/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3146906
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.11.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/02, // A61B17/00
[2017/47]
Former International [2017/13]A61B17/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
TitleGerman:EXCLUDER[2017/13]
English:EXCLUDER[2017/13]
French:ÉCARTEUR[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2016Translation filed 
17.11.2016National basic fee paid 
17.11.2016Search fee paid 
17.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
17.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
10.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US4159719  (HAERR RAYMOND H) [I] 1-5 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 12 * * column 1, line 16 - column 1, line 23 * * column 3, line 49 - column 3, line 60; figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 7 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [I]WO9201433  (YOON INBAE [US]) [I] 1-5 * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 5 * * page 16, line 23 - page 17, line 5 * * page 17, line 13 - page 17, line 21 * * page 17, line 5 - page 17, line 13 * * figures 7-10 * * page 13, line 10 - page 13, line 16 *;
 [A]WO2012087112  (UNIV ERASMUS MEDICAL CT [NL], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 3 - page 5; figures 1-3 *
International search[Y]WO2011111703  (KAWAMOTO CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & JP 5313394 B & EP 2545858 A1 *;
 [Y]JP2011120952  (NIPPON MEDICAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2010/0286474 A1 & WO 2009/084688 A1 & EP 2233101 A1 *;
 [A]WO2010024244  (KAWAMOTO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & JP 5128672 B & EP 2332469 A1 *;
 [A]JP2009089900  (TORAY FINECHEMICALS CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]US3961629  (RICHTER FERDINAND JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *