Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3221250

EP3221250 - STABILISER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leicester, Gordon Charles
Backlands Farm London Road
Hickstead Sussex RH17 5LZ / GB
[2017/39]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/39]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2017/39]
Application number, filing date15797177.117.11.2015
[2017/39]
WO2015GB53476
Priority number, dateGB2014002048518.11.2014         Original published format: GB 201420485
[2017/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016079489
Date:26.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3221250
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016
[2017/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:B66C23/78, E02F9/08, B60S9/00
[2017/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/39]
TitleGerman:STABILISATOR[2017/39]
English:STABILISER[2017/39]
French:STABILISATEUR[2017/39]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2017National basic fee paid 
13.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/39]
13.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2018Fee for grant paid
15.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
01.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/47]
05.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]CN103112788  (ZOOMLION HEAVY IND SCI & TECH) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US4014519  (LEIGH THEODORE M) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2011168148  (KAWAMOTO BRISTLE REFINING) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2002127879  (YAMASHITA HIROSHI) [A] 1-15 * abstract *