Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3218041

EP3218041 - DEVICES FOR FLOW OCCLUSION DURING DEVICE EXCHANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Access Closure, Inc.
5452 Betsy Ross Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2017/38]
Inventor(s)01 / HUNDERTMARK, Ronald, R.
c/o Cardinal Health, Inc.
1500 Waukegan Road
Waukegan, IL 60085 / US
02 / JOE, Wesley, C.
c/o Cardinal Health, Inc.
1500 Waukegan Road
Waukegan, IL 60085 / US
03 / HASSAN, Ali
c/o Cardinal Health, Inc.
1500 Waukegan Road
Waukegan, IL 60085 / US
04 / YAZBECK, Richard, D.
c/o Cardinal Health, Inc.
1500 Waukegan Road
Waukegan, IL 60085 / US
 [2017/38]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/24]
Former [2017/38]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15797803.213.11.2015
[2017/38]
WO2015US60516
Priority number, dateUS20141454231514.11.2014         Original published format: US201414542315
[2017/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016077664
Date:19.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3218041
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016
[2017/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3218041
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/09, A61M25/10, A61M25/00
[2018/51]
Former International [2017/38]A61M25/09, A61M25/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR STRÖMUNGSUNTERBRECHUNG WÄHREND DES AUSTAUSCHS VON VORRICHTUNGEN[2017/38]
English:DEVICES FOR FLOW OCCLUSION DURING DEVICE EXCHANGES[2017/38]
French:DISPOSITIFS D'OCCLUSION D'ÉCOULEMENT PENDANT DES ÉCHANGES DE DISPOSITIF[2017/38]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2017National basic fee paid 
12.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/38]
12.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2019Fee for grant paid
30.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19179549.1  / EP3572116
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Cited inInternational search[XPAI]WO2012178073  (ACCESSCLOSURE INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,13,15-45 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0083] * * figures 3-5B * * paragraph [0024] * [A] 2,4,7 [I] 14