Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3186288

EP3186288 - PROCESS FOR SEPARATING COMPONENTS OF A POLYMER-MONOMER MIXTURE OBTAINED BY HIGH-PRESSURE POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED MONOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  27.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
[2017/27]
Inventor(s)01 / LITTMANN, Dieter
Auf dem Stein 19
35325 Mücke / DE
02 / GROOS, Georg
Ringstrasse 26
67125 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE
03 / FINETTE, Andre-Armand
Sperberweg 20
50997 Köln / DE
04 / DEUERLING, Michael
Siegstrasse 5
53919 Weilerswist / DE
05 / WOLFRAM, Sven
Amundsenstrasse 92
53881 Euskirchen / DE
06 / MOHRBUTTER, Juergen
Am Wurmerich 5
53347 Alfter / DE
07 / KHAYRULLIN, Danir
Geildorfer Bach 30
50321 Bruehl / DE
08 / FIBLA, Claudio
Frankfurter Strasse 10 - Hinterhaus
61462 Königstein im Taunus / DE
09 / WOLF, Christoph
Liethenstrasse 152
50259 Pulheim-Dansweiler / DE
 [2017/27]
Representative(s)Seelert, Stefan , et al
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. E413, 5.OG
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/27]Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. B852, 5th floor
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date15797909.712.11.2015
[2017/27]
WO2015EP76433
Priority number, dateEP2014019297413.11.2014         Original published format: EP 14192974
[2017/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016075235
Date:19.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3186288
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016
[2017/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3186288
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/00, C08F2/01, C08F6/00
[2017/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON KOMPONENTEN EINES MONOMER-GEMISCHES DURCH HOCHDRUCKPOLYMERISATION VON ETHYLENISCH UNGESÄTTIGTEN MONOMEREN[2017/43]
English:PROCESS FOR SEPARATING COMPONENTS OF A POLYMER-MONOMER MIXTURE OBTAINED BY HIGH-PRESSURE POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED MONOMERS[2017/27]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR SÉPARER DES COMPOSANTS D'UN MÉLANGE DE RÉACTION OBTENU PAR POLYMÉRISATION À HAUTE PRESSION DE MONOMÈRES ÉTHYLÉNIQUEMENT INSATURÉS[2017/43]
Former [2017/27]VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON BESTANDTEILEN EINES DURCH HOCHDRUCKPOLYMERISATION VON ETHYLENISCH UNGESÄTTIGTEN MONOMEREN GEWONNENEN POLYMER-MONOMER-GEMISCHES
Former [2017/27]PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DES COMPOSANTS D'UN MÉLANGE POLYMÈRE/MONOMÈRE OBTENU PAR POLYMÉRISATION SOUS HAUTE PRESSION DE MONOMÈRES ÉTHYLÉNIQUEMENT INSATURÉS
Entry into regional phase27.03.2017National basic fee paid 
27.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/27]
27.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2017Fee for grant paid
12.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.10.2018   
Riepe, Hans-Gerd
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
DE-80339 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
 [2018/49]
15.11.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.03.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.11.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.01.2020
16.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE12.11.2018
LU12.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
[2019/48]
Former [2019/40]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
LU12.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
Former [2019/34]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
LU12.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/37]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
Former [2018/36]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Former [2018/35]FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2012240960  (CORNELISSEN PHILIP HENRI [BE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7098301  (SMITH LAWRENCE C [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [AP]WO2015082565  (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE]) [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantGB580182
 DE1219378
 WO2011078856
OppositionWO2011078856
    - "An Overview of Industrial Polyethylene Processes", Malpass Dennis B, Introduction to industrial polyethylene: properties, catalysts, and processes, Wiley, (20100000), pages 88 - 89, ISBN 978-0-470-62598-9, XP055529250
    - BUCHELLI, ALBERTO et al., "Nonequilibrium behavior in ethylene/polyethylene flash separators", Industrial & engineering chemistry research, (20040000), vol. 7, pages 1768 - 1778, XP055517423

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie0302037
    - Anonymous, "LDPE Plant", International Process Plants, URL: www.ippe.com
    - (20130703), URL: https://ireach.prnewswire.com * . *