Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3186288 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3186288



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 385
12.12.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.12.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.12.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.12.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.12.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
09.12.2019 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
09.12.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
09.12.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.12.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
03.12.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.11.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.11.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.11.2019 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.11.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2019 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2019 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
21.06.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.06.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.06.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.06.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.06.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.06.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.06.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
04.06.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.06.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.06.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 33
21.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
21.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
21.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
21.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.03.2019 Claims Opposition 3
21.03.2019 Claims Opposition 3
21.03.2019 Claims Opposition 3
21.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.03.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.03.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.03.2019 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
15.11.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.11.2018 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.11.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.10.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.10.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.10.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.10.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.10.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
30.10.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
16.02.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.01.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.12.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
12.12.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
12.12.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
06.11.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.11.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.11.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.11.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
06.11.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 21
21.09.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.06.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
31.05.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
30.03.2017 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 3
27.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.03.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.06.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
19.05.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.05.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 22
04.03.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.03.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.03.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
13.01.2016 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
13.01.2016 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
30.11.2015 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 7
12.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
12.11.2015 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
12.11.2015 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
12.11.2015 Description PCT receiving Office 16
12.11.2015 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
12.11.2015 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2
12.11.2015 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 6