Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3186288


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2020 [2020/08]
08.12.2019 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
22.11.2019 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
30.08.2019 Change - inventor
28.08.2019 Change - representative
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.06.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
22.03.2019 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
14.11.2018 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Opposition filed published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
29.12.2017 (Expected) grant published on  31.01.2018  [2018/05]
16.12.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.12.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.12.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.10.2017 Change: Validation states published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
27.10.2017 Change - extension states published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
22.09.2017 Change - German title published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
22.09.2017 Change - French title published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
02.06.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
02.06.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
02.06.2017 Request for examination filed published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
19.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2017 Change - representative
27.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
23.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
20.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
02.12.2015 PCT data prior to European publication