Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3148481

EP3148481 - VASO-OCCLUSIVE DEVICES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stryker European Holdings I, LLC
2825 Airview Boulevard
Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US
[2017/14]
Inventor(s)01 / WALLACE, Michael P.
101 E. Mill Street, Unit P
Quakertown, PA 18951 / US
02 / GREENHALGH, E. Skott
101 E. Mill Street, Unit P
Quakertown, PA 18951 / US
 [2017/14]
Representative(s)Lecomte & Partners
P.O. Box 1623
1016 Luxembourg / LU
[2017/14]
Application number, filing date15798783.528.05.2015
[2017/14]
WO2015US32847
Priority number, dateUS20141428955528.05.2014         Original published format: US201414289555
US201562159154P08.05.2015         Original published format: US 201562159154 P
[2017/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015184075
Date:03.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3148481
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.12.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/12
[2017/18]
Former International [2017/14]A61F2/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/14]
TitleGerman:GEFÄSSVERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG[2017/14]
English:VASO-OCCLUSIVE DEVICES AND METHODS OF USE[2017/14]
French:DISPOSITIFS VASO-OCCLUSIFS ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION[2017/14]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2016National basic fee paid 
29.11.2016Search fee paid 
29.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/14]
29.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2013119332  (STOUT MEDICAL GROUP LP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-15 * figures 3,4d,5d,6a-9b,14a-18,20a-22a * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0201] * * paragraph [0213] * [I] 4;
 [A]US8715316  (JANARDHAN VALLABH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 45, line 26 - column 72, line 3; figures 2a-4c,4e,4g,4h *;
 [A]US2013253572  (MOLAEI MASOUD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0097]; figures 1-4,7,8 *;
 [A]WO2010135352  (PNEUMRX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[A]US2014135827  (AMPLATZ KURT [US], et al) [A] 1-46 * ; figure 15; paragraphs [0119]-[0120] *;
 [A]US2013274849  (ZAVER STEVEN G [US], et al) [A] 1-46 * ; paragraph [0043] *;
 [A]US2013112070  (MACH RYAN [US]) [A] 1-46 * ; paragraph [0049] *;
 [A]WO2013119332  (STOUT MEDICAL GROUP LP [US]) [A] 1-46 * ; paragraphs [0092], [0111]; figures 6a-b *;
 [A]US2010228278  (TRAN TRI [US], et al) [A] 27-46 * ; figure 5; paragraphs [0020], [0039], [0067] *;
 [PY]US2014277099  (WALLACE MICHAEL P [US], et al) [PY] 1, 19-20, 27, 37-38 * ; entire document *