Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3224037

EP3224037 - PORTABLE ROLLER COMPACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Husmann Umwelt-Technik GmbH
Gewerbegebiet Nord 2
26892 Dörpen an der Ems / DE
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / HUSMANN, Heinz Hermann
Ahldersweg 32
26871 Papenburg / DE
02 / MUCHALL, Wolfgang
Mittelkanal links 62
26871 Papenburg / DE
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date15800837.525.11.2015
[2017/40]
WO2015EP77649
Priority number, dateDE201420105681U25.11.2014         Original published format: DE 202014105681 U
[2017/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016083453
Date:02.06.2016
Language:DE
[2016/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3224037
Date:04.10.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B30B9/30
[2017/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
TitleGerman:TRANSPORTABLER ROLLENVERDICHTER[2017/40]
English:PORTABLE ROLLER COMPACTOR[2017/40]
French:COMPACTEUR À ROULEAU TRANSPORTABLE[2017/40]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2017National basic fee paid 
12.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
12.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]SU934984  (VSEROSS NIPTI MEKH EL SELSKHOZ [SU]) [X] 1,3-5 * figure - * [Y] 2;
 [X]US4467714  (BERGMANN HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1,3-5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]WO03101716  (J S B CONST [FR]; SOLER ROGER [FR]) [Y] 2,6-10 * figure -; claim - *;
 [YA]EP2110229  (HEINZ BERGMANN MASCHINEN FUER [DE]) [Y] 6-10 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0053]; figure -; claim - * [A] 4;
 [A]WO9321007  (HANSEN POUL [DK]; HANSEN HENRY [SE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE202011000241U  (HEINZ BERGMANN MASCHINE FUER DIE ABFALLWIRTSCHAFT E K [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantEP1513674
 DE102005029199