Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3234621

EP3234621 - TEST APPARATUS FOR CHECKING A BATTERY CONTROL DEVICE OR A BATTERY, AND METHOD FOR TESTING A BATTERY CONTROL DEVICE OR A BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / MATTES, Bernhard
Kopernikusstrasse 9
74343 Sachsenheim / DE
02 / HOENIG, Guenter
Haldenstr. 88
71254 Ditzingen / DE
03 / THOMAS, Robert
St.-Poeltener-Str. 28
70469 Stuttgart / DE
04 / ROTH, Manuel
Stahlweg 4
75365 Calw / DE
 [2017/43]
Application number, filing date15801179.127.11.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015EP77886
Priority number, dateDE20141022619017.12.2014         Original published format: DE102014226190
[2017/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016096371
Date:23.06.2016
Language:DE
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3234621
Date:25.10.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3234621
Date:29.05.2019
Language:DE
[2019/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/36, G01R35/00, H01M10/42, H01M10/48
[2018/51]
Former International [2017/43]G01R31/36, G01R35/00, H01M10/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TESTVORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG EINES BATTERIE-STEUERGERÄTES ODER EINER BATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR TESTUNG EINES BATTERIE-STEUERGERÄTES ODER EINER BATTERIE[2017/43]
English:TEST APPARATUS FOR CHECKING A BATTERY CONTROL DEVICE OR A BATTERY, AND METHOD FOR TESTING A BATTERY CONTROL DEVICE OR A BATTERY[2017/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TEST POUR CONTRÔLER UNE UNITÉ DE COMMANDE DE BATTERIE OU UNE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TESTER UNE UNITÉ DE COMMANDE DE BATTERIE OU UNE BATTERIE[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2017National basic fee paid 
17.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
11.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2019Fee for grant paid
12.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XAI]DE102011054370  (DSPACE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * [A] 3 [I] 6,7;
 [Y]DE102007007268  (TEMIC AUTO ELECTR MOTORS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5 * figure . * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] *;
 [A]CN103941210  (HUBEI TECHPOW ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
    [XAYI] - "Zellspannungsemulation: Spannung garantiert Hochgenaue Zellspannungsemulation mit dem dSPACE HIL-Simulator", INTERNET CITATION, (20100301), pages 40 - 45, URL: http://www.dspace.com/shared/data/pdf/2011/dSPACE-Magazine-2010-03_Batterie_D.pdf, (20120627), XP002679139 [X] 1,2,4,6,9-11 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 6 * * page 41 - page 45 * [A] 3 [Y] 5 [I] 7,8
 [A]  - WAI CHUNG LEE ET AL, "Development of a Hardware-in-the-Loop Simulation System for Testing Cell Balancing Circuits", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, USA, (20131201), vol. 28, no. 12, doi:10.1109/TPEL.2013.2256799, ISSN 0885-8993, pages 5949 - 5959, XP011514361 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPEL.2013.2256799
 [A]  - Sajjad Haidar ET AL, "Use a photoelectric-FET optocoupler as a linear voltage-controlled potentiometer", (20120119), URL: http://www.edn.com/Pdf/ViewPdf?contentItemId=4368893, (20160304), XP055255546 [A] 3 * the whole document *