EP3217918 - ORTHODONTIC ALIGNER WITH ISOLATED SEGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 2820 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2023/49] |
Former [2018/03] | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 2820 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | ||
Former [2017/38] | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 2560 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBBER, Peter 31 Tiana Terrace Lafayette, CA 94549 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Jennifer C. 1021 S. Almansor Street Alhambra, CA 91801 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Yan 10461 Pineville Avenue Cupertino, CA 65014 / US | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher Venner Shipley LLP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [2023/49] |
Former [2017/38] | Eve, Rosemary Margaret Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15801229.4 | 11.11.2015 | [2017/38] | WO2015IB02136 | Priority number, date | US201414539725 | 12.11.2014 Original published format: US201414539725 | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016075528 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3217918 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3217918 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/08 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
A61C7/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61C7/002 (CN,KR,US);
A61C7/36 (CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORTHODONTISCHER AUSRICHTER MIT ISOLIERTEN SEGMENTEN | [2017/38] | English: | ORTHODONTIC ALIGNER WITH ISOLATED SEGMENTS | [2017/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT ORTHODONTIQUE COMPORTANT DES SEGMENTS ISOLÉS | [2017/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 09.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.03.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 27.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 22.04.2021 | Appeal received No. T0486/21 | 22.04.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 27.04.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.04.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 07.03.2024 | [2024/20] | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003190575 (HILLIARD JACK KEITH [US]) [X] 1,3,5-7,9,10,14,15 * paragraphs [0065] - [0070] - [0018] * [I] 13,16-20; | [XI]US2004013993 (ITO GAKUJI [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0067] - [0071] - [0 82] , [0 83] , [0 84] , [0 28] * [I] 3-5,7,8,12,14,16-20; | [XI]US2010075268 (DURAN VON ARX JOSEP [ES]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-12,15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0032] - [0062] - [0077]; figures 1-3, 13, 14 * [I] 4,13,14; | [XI]US2011185525 (STAPELBROEK MARTINUS BERNARDUS [NL], et al) [X] 1,9,13,15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 15] - [0018] * [I] 10,16-20; | [X]KR200465679Y (SUNG W Y) [X] 6,7,13 * paragraphs [0032] - [0041] *; | [XP]US2015257856 (MARTZ MARTIN G [US], et al) [XP] 1-3,5-8,10,11,15* paragraphs [0045] - [0052] - [0 55] * | Examination | US2015083140 | WO2015140614 | WO2016145320 |