Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3233702

EP3233702 - ELEVATOR ROPE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAID ELEVATOR ROPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bekaert Advanced Cords Aalter NV
Léon Bekaertlaan 5
9880 Aalter / BE
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN WASSENHOVE, Veerle
Pastorijstraat 14
8700 Aarsele / BE
02 / ROMMEL, Hendrik
Graaf Pierre de Brieylaan 27
8200 Sint-Michiels / BE
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Seynhaeve, Geert Filiep
NV Bekaert SA
IPD - PC6030
Bekaertstraat 2
8550 Zwevegem / BE
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15802107.101.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015EP78136
Priority number, dateEP2014019917219.12.2014         Original published format: EP 14199172
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016096395
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3233702
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B66B7/06, D07B1/16, D07B1/06
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:AUFZUGSSEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DIESES AUFZUGSSEILS[2017/43]
English:ELEVATOR ROPE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAID ELEVATOR ROPE[2017/43]
French:CÂBLE D'ASCENSEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT CÂBLE D'ASCENSEUR[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2017National basic fee paid 
19.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
19.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2014008154  (WESSON JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0037]; figures 2,8 * [I] 2-14;
 [AD]WO2013053621  (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]) [AD] 1,15 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9943589
 EP1213250
 JP2004131897
 DE102012015580
 US2011192131
 WO2013053621