Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3153815

EP3153815 - MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/15]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKANO, Ryohei
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2017/52]
Former [2017/15]01 / NAKANO, Ryohei
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1
Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/15]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15803513.912.05.2015
[2017/15]
WO2015JP02399
Priority number, dateJP2014011801906.06.2014         Original published format: JP 2014118019
[2017/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015186299
Date:10.12.2015
Language:JA
[2015/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3153815
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3153815
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.12.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/27, B29D30/30, B65H26/00
[2017/22]
Former International [2017/15]G01B11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:MESSVORRICHTUNG[2017/15]
English:MEASURING DEVICE[2017/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MESURE[2017/15]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2016Translation filed 
10.11.2016National basic fee paid 
10.11.2016Search fee paid 
10.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/15]
10.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2018Fee for grant paid
14.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/24]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
NO04.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL04.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007247636  (MATSUOKA NOBUO [JP]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [X]JPH06213624  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE10036010  (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1, 6 *;
 [Y]US2005117708  (CHO YOUNG-BIN [CA] ET AL) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US2014015957  (FUJIKAWA MASAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0117]; figures 1-17 *
International search[Y]JPH06213624  (Bridgestone Corp.) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0026]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2012193980  (Omron Corp.) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0020], [0023] to [0027], [0094] to [0116] & US 2014/0015957 A1 paragraphs [0003] to [0021], [0047] to [0051], [0118] to [0140] & WO 2012/124140 A1 & EP 2667350 A1 & CN 103348376 A *;
 [A]JP2002131030  (Toyo Tire and Rubber Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0013] to [0024] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH07332926  (The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0030] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010197240  (Fuji Electric Systems Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0050] to [0059] (Family: none) *