Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3148669

EP3148669 - IN-SITU SUBSURFACE EXTRACTION AND DECONTAMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.05.2018  [2018/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lundy, William L.
6412 Elm Lane
Oak Forest, Illinois 60452 / US
[2017/14]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/14]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/14]Cordina, Kevin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date15803895.002.06.2015
[2017/14]
WO2015US33783
Priority number, dateUS201462006721P02.06.2014         Original published format: US 201462006721 P
[2017/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015187692
Date:10.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3148669
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.12.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01D33/82, B09C1/08, C02F101/20, C02F101/36
[2017/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/14]
TitleGerman:UNTERIRDISCHE IN-SITU-EXTRAKTION UND DEKONTAMINATION[2017/14]
English:IN-SITU SUBSURFACE EXTRACTION AND DECONTAMINATION[2017/14]
French:EXTRACTION ET DÉCONTAMINATION EN SUBSURFACE IN SITU[2017/14]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2016National basic fee paid 
09.12.2016Search fee paid 
09.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/14]
09.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/22]
12.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2012155029  (LUNDY WILLIAM L [US]) [X] 2-14 * paragraphs [0022] , [0028] , [0033] , [0053] , [0063] , [0065] , [0069]; example 1 * [A] 1,15;
 [A]US2002156337  (JENSEN RICHARD H [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0060] *
International search[X]US2010185039  (HOAG et al.) [X] 1-34 * , Fig. 1; para [0008], [0012], [0084], [0086], [0095], [0096], [0104], [0109], [0118], [0122], [0124], [01263; [0151], [0164], [0174], [0196], [0208]-[0211], [0214], [0221]-[0225] *;
 [Y]US2009087265  (LUNDY) [Y] 1-34 * , para [0011]-[0040] *;
 [Y]US2007116524  (SHIAU) [Y] 1-34 * , para [0011]-[0088j *;
 [Y]US2005207846  (NICKELSON et al.) [Y] 1-34 * , para [0017]-[0092] *;
 [Y]US5728302  (CONNOR et al.) [Y] 1-34 * , col 2, In 39 to col 8, In 31 *