Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3217882

EP3217882 - RADIOLOGICAL APPARATUS WITH A TABLE MOVEMENT SYSTEM WITH VARIABLE ANGLE RODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Medical Merate S.p.A.
Via Partigiani 25
24068 Seriate / IT
[2017/38]
Inventor(s)01 / SCARPELLINI, Luciano
c/o GENERAL MEDICAL MERATE S.p.A.
VIA PARTIGIANI 25
I-24068 Seriate (BG) / IT
 [2017/38]
Representative(s)De Ros, Alberto
Studio Legale Bird & Bird
Via Borgogna, 8
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2017/38]De Ros, Alberto
ADV IP S.r.l.
Via Conservatorio, 22
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date15804589.805.11.2015
[2017/38]
WO2015IB58547
Priority number, dateIT2014CO0003511.11.2014         Original published format: IT CO20140035
[2017/38]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016075594
Date:19.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3217882
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016
[2017/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/04, A61B6/00
[2017/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/38]
TitleGerman:RADIOLOGISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT TISCHBEWEGUNGSSYSTEM MIT VARIABLEN WINKELSTANGEN[2017/38]
English:RADIOLOGICAL APPARATUS WITH A TABLE MOVEMENT SYSTEM WITH VARIABLE ANGLE RODS[2017/38]
French:APPAREIL RADIOLOGIQUE AVEC UN SYSTÈME DE DÉPLACEMENT DE TABLE AVEC TIGES À ANGLE VARIABLE[2017/38]
Entry into regional phase24.05.2017National basic fee paid 
24.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
24.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/38]
24.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2012023671  (MIYANO IWAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038]; figures 2-5 * [A] 6-8 [I] 4,5;
 [XY]US2012198624  (ZHENG MIKE Q [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0040]; figure - * [Y] 10,11;
 [YA]US4484343  (CESAR JEAN [FR]) [Y] 10,11 * column 3, line 33 - column 9, line 65; figure - * [A] 1-9
by applicantUS2012023671